NY S04972 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Excludes certain graduate students from mandatory fees.
Title
Excludes certain graduate students from mandatory fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2022-03-07 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4972B |
2022-03-07 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2021-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-05-19 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1017 |
2021-05-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4972A |
2021-05-05 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2021-04-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2021-02-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06382 (Same As) 2022-04-12 - print number 6382a