NY S04965 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-21 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-21 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for automatic enrollment and recertification simplification for Medicaid managed care plans and long term care plans.
Title
Provides for automatic enrollment and recertification simplification for Medicaid managed care plans and long term care plans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-11 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-11 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-21 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2022-03-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-03-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-01-18 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-01-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-01-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.117 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-06-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-19 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1037 |
2021-02-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A00155 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to ways and means