NY S04957 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-24 - SIGNED CHAP.40
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the Schenevus central school district to apply to the commissioner of education to receive an apportionment to be used for services and expenses of such school district and to support its educational programs and any liability in carrying out the functions and responsibilities of such district.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the Schenevus central school district to apply to the commissioner of education to receive an apportionment to be used for services and expenses of such school district and to support its educational programs and any liability in carrying out the functions and responsibilities of such district.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-24AssemblySIGNED CHAP.40
2019-06-24SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2019-06-05Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-05Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-05Assemblyordered to third reading cal.553
2019-06-05Assemblysubstituted for a7499
2019-05-15Assemblyreferred to education
2019-05-15SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-05-15SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-05-13SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-08Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-07Senate1ST REPORT CAL.611
2019-04-09SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2019-04-02SenateREFERRED TO EDUCATION

Same As/Similar To

A07499 (Same As) 2019-06-05 - substituted by s4957

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback