NY S04953 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-01 - referred to correction
Pending: Assembly Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-01 - referred to correction
Pending: Assembly Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes the failure of a sex offender to register or verify pursuant to the provisions of the sex offender registration act or violation of the prohibition on sex offenders being employed on a motor vehicle engaged in the retail sale of frozen desserts a class D felony.
Title
Makes the failure of a sex offender to register or verify pursuant to the provisions of the sex offender registration act or violation of the prohibition on sex offenders being employed on a motor vehicle engaged in the retail sale of frozen desserts a class D felony.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2016-06-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-05-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-05-18 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.940 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2015-04-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A08678 (Same As) 2016-01-12 - referred to correction