NY S04940 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - SIGNED CHAP.44
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - SIGNED CHAP.44
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the county of Westchester to impose an additional rate of sales and compensating use tax; extends the Westchester county spending limitation act.
Title
Authorizes the county of Westchester to impose an additional rate of sales and compensating use tax; extends the Westchester county spending limitation act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.44 |
2019-06-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | home rule request |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.60 |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | substituted for a7081 |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-04-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-04-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-04-09 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.397 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4940B |
2019-04-05 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2019-04-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4940A |
2019-04-04 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2019-04-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A05840 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
A07081 (Same As) 2019-06-30 - SIGNED CHAP.44
A07081 (Same As) 2019-06-30 - SIGNED CHAP.44