NY S04938 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands remedies for violations of New York state uniform fire prevention and building code.
Title
Expands remedies for violations of New York state uniform fire prevention and building code.
Sponsors
Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. Brian Kavanagh [D] | Sen. Monica Martinez [D] |
Sen. Jen Metzger [D] | Sen. James Skoufis [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-12 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2020-02-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-02-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-02-11 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.391 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2019-04-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A02128 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to governmental operations