NY S04937 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-07 - SIGNED CHAP.214
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-07 - SIGNED CHAP.214
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes any dwelling with a certificate authorizing occupancy as a Class B hotel to also authorize occupancy of such units in such dwelling for permanent residence purposes.
Title
Authorizes any dwelling with a certificate authorizing occupancy as a Class B hotel to also authorize occupancy of such units in such dwelling for permanent residence purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 127 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-07 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.214 |
2022-06-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.605 |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | substituted for a6262b |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2022-05-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-10 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4937C |
2022-05-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1007 |
2022-04-26 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2022-03-25 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4937B |
2022-03-25 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2022-03-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4937A |
2022-03-15 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2021-02-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A06154 (Same As) 2021-03-12 - enacting clause stricken
A06262 (Same As) 2022-06-02 - substituted by s4937c
A06262 (Same As) 2022-06-02 - substituted by s4937c