NY S04928 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-29 - VETOED MEMO.581
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides Queens county with jurisdiction for cases arising from Rikers Island facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides Queens county with jurisdiction for cases arising from Rikers Island facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-12-29AssemblyVETOED MEMO.581
2014-12-17SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2014-06-11Assemblyreturned to senate
2014-06-11Assemblypassed assembly
2014-06-11Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.143
2014-06-11Assemblysubstituted for a7333b
2014-05-29Assemblyreferred to codes
2014-05-29SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2014-05-29SenatePASSED SENATE
2014-05-19SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2014-05-14Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2014-05-13Senate1ST REPORT CAL.759
2014-01-17SenatePRINT NUMBER 4928B
2014-01-17SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES
2014-01-08SenateREFERRED TO CODES
2014-01-08Assemblyreturned to senate
2014-01-08Assemblydied in assembly
2013-06-20Assemblyreferred to codes
2013-06-20AssemblyRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2013-06-20SenateREPASSED SENATE
2013-06-17SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 4928A
2013-06-17SenateVOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING
2013-06-14Senatereturned to senate
2013-06-14AssemblyRECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY
2013-06-05Assemblyreferred to codes
2013-06-05SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2013-06-05SenatePASSED SENATE
2013-06-03SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2013-05-30Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2013-05-29Senate1ST REPORT CAL.783
2013-05-01SenateREFERRED TO CODES

Same As/Similar To

A07333 (Same As) 2014-06-11 - substituted by s4928b

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04928&term=2013&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04928&term=2013&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S04928
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04928&term=2013&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S04928A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04928&term=2013&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S04928B
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2013/S4928#SF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04928&term=2013&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback