NY S04925 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-03 - SIGNED CHAP.328
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-03 - SIGNED CHAP.328
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Broadens the geriatric service demonstration program to include older adults with mental health disabilities and substance use disorder; renames the program to be the geriatric mental health and substance use disorder demonstration program; allows for grants to be awarded by the office to providers of care to older adults with substance use disorder.
Title
Broadens the geriatric service demonstration program to include older adults with mental health disabilities and substance use disorder; renames the program to be the geriatric mental health and substance use disorder demonstration program; allows for grants to be awarded by the office to providers of care to older adults with substance use disorder.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Mental Health And Developmental Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Mental Health And Developmental Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-03 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.328 |
2019-10-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.397 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | substituted for a3193a |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-05-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-14 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 4925A |
2019-05-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.512 |
2019-03-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A03193 (Same As) 2019-10-03 - SIGNED CHAP.328