NY S04910 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - approval memo.10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - approval memo.10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to disclosure of the identities of political committees making certain expenditures for political communications.
Title
Relates to disclosure of the identities of political committees making certain expenditures for political communications.
Sponsors
Sen. James Skoufis [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Andrew Gounardes [D] |
Sen. John Liu [D] | Sen. Rachel May [D] | Sen. Michael Ranzenhofer [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-08 | Senate | approval memo.10 |
2019-11-08 | Senate | signed chap.454 |
2019-10-28 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.712 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4910 |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2019-03-12 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-03-12 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-03-12 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.38 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | rules report cal.38 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | reported |
2019-03-12 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-03-12 | Senate | reported referred to codes |
2019-02-05 | Senate | referred to election law |
2019-06-13 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A4668 |
2019-05-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.712 |
2019-03-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A04668 (Same As) 2019-11-08 - approval memo.10