NY S04905 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on May 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the crime of theft of rental property or equipment.
Title
Creates the crime of theft of rental property or equipment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2013-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-06-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-06-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-06-05 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1161 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A07184 (Same As) 2014-04-07 - held for consideration in codes