NY S04899 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-11 - SIGNED CHAP.546
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-11 - SIGNED CHAP.546
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the payment of foreign fire insurance premium taxes by the Volunteer Exempt Firefighter's Benevolent Association of Manhasset-Lakeville.
Title
Relates to the payment of foreign fire insurance premium taxes by the Volunteer Exempt Firefighter's Benevolent Association of Manhasset-Lakeville.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-11 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.546 |
2015-11-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.244 |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | substituted for a6134 |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2015-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-11 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1495 |
2015-06-11 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-04-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A06134 (Same As) 2015-06-15 - substituted by s4899