NY S04898 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Designates a portion of the state highway system in the town of Fishkill, Dutchess county as the "Private Sidney A. Scofield Memorial Highway".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designates a portion of the state highway system in the town of Fishkill, Dutchess county as the "Private Sidney A. Scofield Memorial Highway".

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-07SenateRECOMMITTED TO RULES
2024-05-28SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1472
2024-05-28SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
2023-06-10SenateRECOMMITTED TO RULES
2023-06-01SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1487
2023-06-01SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2023-05-15SenatePRINT NUMBER 4898A
2023-05-15SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION
2023-02-16SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION

Same As/Similar To

A06284 (Same As) 2024-01-16 - committed to transportation

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback