NY S04893 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5684A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5684A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires operators of nursing homes and residential health care facilities to provide notification of certain contracts and agreements to all residents, representatives, staff and the office of the long-term care ombudsman.
Title
Requires operators of nursing homes and residential health care facilities to provide notification of certain contracts and agreements to all residents, representatives, staff and the office of the long-term care ombudsman.
Sponsors
Sen. Gustavo Rivera [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. Michelle Hinchey [D] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] |
Sen. Kevin Parker [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A5684A |
2021-03-17 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4893A |
2021-03-17 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2021-03-17 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-03-17 | Senate | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | referred to health |
2021-02-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-02-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-02-22 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.372 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-02-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A05684 (Same As) 2021-04-27 - approval memo.5