NY S04889 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-28 - referred to insurance
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-28 - referred to insurance
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for coverage for the treatment of asthma.
Title
Provides for coverage for the treatment of asthma.
Sponsors
Sen. Gustavo Rivera [D] | Sen. Jamaal Bailey [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Rachel May [D] |
Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] | Sen. Lea Webb [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-28 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2024-05-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-05-28 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-05-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-05-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-05-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1388 |
2024-01-22 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2023-05-31 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-05-31 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-05-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-05-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-05-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.851 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A09826 (Same As) 2024-04-09 - referred to insurance