NY S04878 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the public service commission to review broadband and fiber optic services within the state; requires the expansion of broadband and fiber optic services.
Title
Requires the public service commission to review broadband and fiber optic services within the state; requires the expansion of broadband and fiber optic services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2021-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-03-23 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4878B |
2021-03-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-03-18 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.600 |
2021-02-25 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4878A |
2021-02-25 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2021-02-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |