NY S04874 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE
Pending: Senate Budget and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Imposes an excise tax on sugary drinks; establishes a community health equity fund to utilize the revenues generated by such tax.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Imposes an excise tax on sugary drinks; establishes a community health equity fund to utilize the revenues generated by such tax.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE
2023-12-20SenatePRINT NUMBER 4874A
2023-12-20SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO BUDGET AND REVENUE
2023-02-16SenateREFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE

Same As/Similar To

A05107 (Same As) 2024-01-29 - print number 5107a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback