NY S04873 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-22 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-22 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the board of trustees of the state university of New York and the city university of New York to report on the current composition of faculty at four year campuses and community colleges.
Title
Directs the board of trustees of the state university of New York and the city university of New York to report on the current composition of faculty at four year campuses and community colleges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-22 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2020-01-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.130 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2019-06-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-07 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4873A |
2019-05-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.478 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A04363 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to higher education