NY S04864 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes fire districts within the definition of "municipal corporation" to include employees of fire districts within the health care and mental hygiene worker bonuses.
Title
Includes fire districts within the definition of "municipal corporation" to include employees of fire districts within the health care and mental hygiene worker bonuses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-06-06 | Assembly | referred to health |
2023-06-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-06-01 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1485 |
2023-06-01 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-02-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A06837 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to health