NY S04863 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-23 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4677A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-23 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4677A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits agencies from charging a fee for records where an electronic copy is already available from a previous request made within the past six months; requires that fees be apportioned equally among requestors when more than one request is made for identical records before such request has been fulfilled.
Title
Prohibits agencies from charging a fee for records where an electronic copy is already available from a previous request made within the past six months; requires that fees be apportioned equally among requestors when more than one request is made for identical records before such request has been fulfilled.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A4677A |
2022-04-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-04-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.794 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2021-05-07 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4863A |
2021-05-07 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2021-02-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A04677 (Same As) 2022-12-23 - approval memo.60