NY S04862 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES
Pending: Senate Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES
Pending: Senate Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to fingerprinting and background checks of construction contractors.
Title
Relates to fingerprinting and background checks of construction contractors.
Sponsors
Sen. Monica Martinez [D] | Sen. John Brooks [D] | Sen. James Gaughran [D] | Sen. Todd Kaminsky [D] |
Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] | Sen. Kevin Thomas [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | referred to education |
2019-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1552 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4862B |
2019-05-29 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2019-04-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4862A |
2019-04-17 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2019-03-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A07356 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to education