NY S04856 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7469
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7469
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires policies and contracts that provide coverage for prescription drugs to include coverage of an immediate additional thirty-day supply of a prescription drug during a state disaster emergency.
Title
Requires policies and contracts that provide coverage for prescription drugs to include coverage of an immediate additional thirty-day supply of a prescription drug during a state disaster emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Elijah Reichlin-Melnick [D] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. John Brooks [D] | Sen. James Gaughran [D] |
Sen. John Mannion [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7469 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-04-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.761 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-05-04 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2021-05-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-03-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-03-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.481 |
2021-02-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A07469 (Same As) 2022-12-28 - approval memo.78