NY S04855 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on September 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-07 - SIGNED CHAP.452
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on September 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-07 - SIGNED CHAP.452
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases membership on the state procurement council to include a member of a not-for-profit organization representing the agricultural interests in the state.
Title
Increases membership on the state procurement council to include a member of a not-for-profit organization representing the agricultural interests in the state.
Sponsors
Sen. Velmanette Montgomery [D] | Sen. Martin Dilan [D] | Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] | Sen. Ruth Hassell-Thompson [D] |
Sen. Suzi Oppenheimer [D] | Sen. David Valesky [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-07 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.452 |
2012-08-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.475 |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a7515a |
2012-06-04 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2012-06-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-05-30 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.966 |
2012-05-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4855A |
2012-05-29 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2012-03-12 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-02-21 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2011-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-13 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1160 |
2011-06-11 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2011-04-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A07515 (Same As) 2012-06-20 - substituted by s4855a