NY S04851 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-29 - SIGNED CHAP.171
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-29 - SIGNED CHAP.171
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the sale of municipal obligations by the county of Erie.
Title
Relates to the sale of municipal obligations by the county of Erie.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 110 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-29 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.171 |
2021-06-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | home rule request |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.439 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | substituted for a5464 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2021-06-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-03-18 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-03-17 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.563 |
2021-02-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A05464 (Same As) 2021-06-07 - substituted by s4851