NY S04849 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6014A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6014A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases penalties for purposefully obstructed license plates to no less than fifty nor more than three hundred dollars.
Title
Increases penalties for purposefully obstructed license plates to no less than fifty nor more than three hundred dollars.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-09 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6014A |
2021-06-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1641 |
2021-06-08 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-05-27 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4849A |
2021-05-27 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2021-02-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06014 (Same As) 2021-10-08 - signed chap.451