NY S04845 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6264
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6264
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides time frames within which service by mailing must be made both within and without the state.
Title
Provides time frames within which service by mailing must be made both within and without the state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6264 |
2015-05-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-04-29 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.453 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A06264 (Same As) 2015-12-22 - signed chap.572