NY S04830 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-13 - SIGNED CHAP.187
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-13 - SIGNED CHAP.187
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the provisions of the Welfare Reform Act of 1997 to 2017.
Title
Extends the provisions of the Welfare Reform Act of 1997 to 2017.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-13 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.187 |
2015-08-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-06-24 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2015-06-24 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-24 | Assembly | motion to amend lost |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.267 |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | substituted for a7192 |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2015-06-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-09 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1412 |
2015-06-09 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-06-02 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2015-04-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
Same As/Similar To
A07192 (Same As) 2015-06-15 - substituted by s4830