NY S04829 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
Pending: Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
Pending: Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Confers authority upon the dormitory authority to finance and construct facilities for organizations undertaking certain projects.
Title
Confers authority upon the dormitory authority to finance and construct facilities for organizations undertaking certain projects.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2015-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1822 |
2015-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-06-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4829A |
2015-06-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2015-05-12 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO HEALTH |
2015-04-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06077 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions