NY S04824 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - APPROVAL MEMO.141
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - APPROVAL MEMO.141
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires each electric corporation to submit a storm hardening and system resiliency plan to the public service commission for review and approval; makes related provisions (Part A); requires utility companies to reimburse customers for certain widespread prolonged outages; prohibits utility companies from recovering from customers the costs incurred due to power outage reimbursements; authorizes utility companies to petition the public service commission for a waiver of the reimbursement requirements (Part B).
Title
Requires each electric corporation to submit a storm hardening and system resiliency plan to the public service commission for review and approval; makes related provisions (Part A); requires utility companies to reimburse customers for certain widespread prolonged outages; prohibits utility companies from recovering from customers the costs incurred due to power outage reimbursements; authorizes utility companies to petition the public service commission for a waiver of the reimbursement requirements (Part B).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 125 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-22 | Senate | APPROVAL MEMO.141 |
2021-12-22 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.786 |
2021-12-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.170 |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | substituted for a3360a |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2021-06-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-10 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1777 |
2021-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-06-07 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4824A |
2021-06-07 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2021-02-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A03360 (Same As) 2021-06-10 - substituted by s4824a