NY S04817 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits the disclosure of the names, addresses and telephone numbers of contributors and the amounts contributed that are reported on financial disclosure reports of certain not-for-profit organizations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits the disclosure of the names, addresses and telephone numbers of contributors and the amounts contributed that are reported on financial disclosure reports of certain not-for-profit organizations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-10Assemblyreturned to senate
2021-06-10Assemblypassed assembly
2021-06-10Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.751
2021-06-10Assemblysubstituted for a1141a
2021-06-09Assemblyreferred to codes
2021-06-09SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2021-06-09SenatePASSED SENATE
2021-05-24SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 4817A
2021-05-19SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2021-05-12Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2021-05-11Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1014
2021-02-12SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE

Same As/Similar To

A01141 (Same As) 2021-06-10 - substituted by s4817a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback