NY S04809 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-14 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-14 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the county of Putnam to grant exemption from county sales and use taxes during the period August 15 - 24, 2016 for clothing and footwear.
Title
Authorizes the county of Putnam to grant exemption from county sales and use taxes during the period August 15 - 24, 2016 for clothing and footwear.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-14 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2016-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-14 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1727 |
2016-06-14 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-05-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4809A |
2016-05-04 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2015-06-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-05-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-05-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.748 |
2015-04-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07205 (Same As) 2016-06-15 - held for consideration in ways and means