NY S04804 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an electronic open auction public bond sale pilot program for certain municipalities, to be administered by the municipality's chief fiscal officer and calls for an evaluation of the program annually.
Title
Establishes an electronic open auction public bond sale pilot program for certain municipalities, to be administered by the municipality's chief fiscal officer and calls for an evaluation of the program annually.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2019-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1690 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4804B |
2019-05-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-04-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4804A |
2019-04-05 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-03-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07266 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to local governments