NY S04802 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the commissioner of agriculture and markets to identify and develop standards for therapy dogs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the commissioner of agriculture and markets to identify and develop standards for therapy dogs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Domestic Animal Welfare Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-18Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.278
2019-06-18Assemblysubstituted for a6601
2019-06-14Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2019-06-14SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-14SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-05-30SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1014
2019-05-30SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-05-01SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2019-03-26SenateREFERRED TO DOMESTIC ANIMAL WELFARE

Same As/Similar To

A06601 (Same As) 2019-06-18 - substituted by s4802

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback