NY S04802 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-03 - SIGNED CHAP.574
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-03 - SIGNED CHAP.574
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the commissioner of agriculture and markets to identify and develop standards for therapy dogs.
Title
Requires the commissioner of agriculture and markets to identify and develop standards for therapy dogs.
Sponsors
Sen. Monica Martinez [D] | Sen. James Gaughran [D] | Sen. Daphne Jordan [R] | Sen. Zellnor Myrie [D] |
Sen. Michael Ranzenhofer [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Domestic Animal Welfare Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Domestic Animal Welfare Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-03 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.574 |
2019-11-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.278 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a6601 |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-30 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1014 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-01 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-03-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO DOMESTIC ANIMAL WELFARE |
Same As/Similar To
A06601 (Same As) 2019-12-03 - SIGNED CHAP.574