NY S04766 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to medicaid eligibility for youth leaving court ordered placement.
Title
Relates to medicaid eligibility for youth leaving court ordered placement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2021-05-27 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4766A |
2021-05-27 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2021-02-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A02417 (Same As) 2021-06-10 - reported referred to rules
A09256 (Same As) 2022-03-01 - reported referred to ways and means
A09256 (Same As) 2022-03-01 - reported referred to ways and means