NY S04757 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - referred to election law
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - referred to election law
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the text to be used in a proposed amendment, proposition or question to be submitted to the people for approval shall be in the legislation proposing such amendment, proposition or question and shall not be altered without approval by the legislature.
Title
Provides that the text to be used in a proposed amendment, proposition or question to be submitted to the people for approval shall be in the legislation proposing such amendment, proposition or question and shall not be altered without approval by the legislature.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2018-03-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-03-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-02-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-02-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.458 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2017-05-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-05-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-05-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.682 |
2017-02-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A08392 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to election law