NY S04753 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Vetoed on August 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-13 - VETOED MEMO.197
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on August 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-13 - VETOED MEMO.197
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts commercial fuel cell systems and electricity provided by such sources from sales tax imposed by article 28 of the tax law and omits such exemption from the taxes imposed pursuant to the authority of article 29 of the tax law.
Title
Exempts commercial fuel cell systems and electricity provided by such sources from sales tax imposed by article 28 of the tax law and omits such exemption from the taxes imposed pursuant to the authority of article 29 of the tax law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-13 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.197 |
2015-08-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.146 |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | substituted for a7236 |
2015-05-27 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2015-05-27 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-05-27 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2015-05-04 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4753A |
2015-05-04 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2015-05-04 | Senate | returned to senate |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2015-04-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-04-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-04-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.363 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-04-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07236 (Same As) 2015-06-09 - substituted by s4753a