NY S04751 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the town of Chester to establish community preservation funds; establishes a real estate transfer tax with revenues therefrom to be deposited in said community preservation fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the town of Chester to establish community preservation funds; establishes a real estate transfer tax with revenues therefrom to be deposited in said community preservation fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2024-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2024-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2023-05-30Assemblyreferred to local governments
2023-05-30SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-05-30SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-05-22SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1094
2023-05-22SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2023-02-14SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

A05211 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to local governments

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback