NY S04742 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes special permits to remain open during certain hours of the morning.
Title
Authorizes special permits to remain open during certain hours of the morning.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate Investigations And Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate Investigations And Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-03-31 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2023-03-31 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-03-31 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-03-23 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4742A |
2023-03-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-03-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-03-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.488 |
2023-02-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |