NY S04742 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to prohibiting homeowners' associations from restricting the installation of or use of solar power systems.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to prohibiting homeowners' associations from restricting the installation of or use of solar power systems.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2020-02-12Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2020-02-11Senate1ST REPORT CAL.418
2020-01-08SenateREFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
2020-01-08Assemblyreturned to senate
2020-01-08Assemblydied in assembly
2019-04-30Assemblyreferred to housing
2019-04-30SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-04-30SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-04-29SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-04-10Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-04-09Senate1ST REPORT CAL.452
2019-04-03SenatePRINT NUMBER 4742A
2019-04-03SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
2019-03-22SenateREFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT

Same As/Similar To

A05896 (Same As) 2020-03-05 - advanced to third reading cal.461

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback