NY S04739 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires accessible buses to be available within a service area measuring three miles from any bus line of the authority or its subsidiaries.
Title
Requires accessible buses to be available within a service area measuring three miles from any bus line of the authority or its subsidiaries.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-16 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-05 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2023-05-16 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2023-02-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A04165 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to transportation