NY S04737 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.314
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.314
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the North Patchogue Fire District to lease certain lands to the Eastern Suffolk BOCES for educational and administrative purposes; further authorizes the commissioner of general services to amend the instrument of conveyance to conform to the provisions of this act.
Title
Authorizes the North Patchogue Fire District to lease certain lands to the Eastern Suffolk BOCES for educational and administrative purposes; further authorizes the commissioner of general services to amend the instrument of conveyance to conform to the provisions of this act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-13 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.314 |
2017-09-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.541 |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a6970a |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2017-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-05-15 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4737A |
2017-03-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-03-08 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.341 |
2017-02-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A06970 (Same As) 2017-06-20 - substituted by s4737a