NY S04734 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the commissioner of finance of the city of New York to establish a property tax amnesty program; provides that such program shall last for 4 months and shall forgive up to $1000 of interest on a delinquent tax bill if 100 percent of the principal bill is paid.
Title
Authorizes the commissioner of finance of the city of New York to establish a property tax amnesty program; provides that such program shall last for 4 months and shall forgive up to $1000 of interest on a delinquent tax bill if 100 percent of the principal bill is paid.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-07 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2024-05-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-05-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-05-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1336 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES 1 |
2023-02-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES 1 |
Same As/Similar To
A05810 (Same As) 2023-07-17 - enacting clause stricken