NY S04730 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the operation of games of chance by employees of authorized organizations.
Title
Relates to the operation of games of chance by employees of authorized organizations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2020-02-14 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-04-10 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-03-28 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2019-03-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A05245 (Same As) 2020-07-15 - held for consideration in racing and wagering