NY S04729 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - SIGNED CHAP.73
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - SIGNED CHAP.73
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to permitting deer hunting the first Monday after November 15th through the first Tuesday after December 7th in Seneca county.
Title
Relates to permitting deer hunting the first Monday after November 15th through the first Tuesday after December 7th in Seneca county.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-02 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.73 |
2015-07-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.370 |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | substituted for a6952 |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2015-05-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-05-28 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-05-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-05-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.542 |
2015-04-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06952 (Same As) 2015-06-16 - substituted by s4729