NY S04725 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on December 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-16 - VETOED MEMO.236
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-16 - VETOED MEMO.236
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Patrick Humiston to receive certain service credit under section 384-d of the retirement and social security law.
Title
Authorizes Patrick Humiston to receive certain service credit under section 384-d of the retirement and social security law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-16 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.236 |
2019-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | home rule request |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.625 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a6998 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-17 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2019-06-17 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1429 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-03-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06998 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - VETOED MEMO.236