NY S04719 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1414A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1414A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that members of the civil air patrol shall be entitled to paid leave for emergency services during a declared state of emergency.
Title
Provides that members of the civil air patrol shall be entitled to paid leave for emergency services during a declared state of emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. John Brooks [D] | Sen. Fred Akshar [R] | Sen. Pamela Helming [R] | Sen. Daphne Jordan [R] |
Sen. Patricia Ritchie [R] | Sen. Daniel Stec [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A1414A |
2021-05-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1248 |
2021-05-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4719A |
2021-05-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2021-02-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
A01414 (Same As) 2021-10-08 - signed chap.438