NY S04719 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-12 - SIGNED CHAP.255
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-12 - SIGNED CHAP.255
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Curt McDermott, a part-time town of Shawangunk police officer in the county of Ulster, to take the civil service examination for full-time police officer, and to be placed on the eligible list for appointment if his score on the examination is high enough.
Title
Authorizes Curt McDermott, a part-time town of Shawangunk police officer in the county of Ulster, to take the civil service examination for full-time police officer, and to be placed on the eligible list for appointment if his score on the examination is high enough.
Sponsors
Sen. Jen Metzger [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-12 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.255 |
2019-09-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.595 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a6780a |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.922 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4719A |
2019-05-21 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2019-03-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06780 (Same As) 2019-09-12 - SIGNED CHAP.255