NY S04712 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 19 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-24 - PRINT NUMBER 4712A
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 19 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-24 - PRINT NUMBER 4712A
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a study and report on the total cost of student assessments; survey of teachers and administrators on test-prep time for student assessments; prohibits the use of certain assessments to be used for anything other than diagnostic purposes.
Title
Requires a study and report on the total cost of student assessments; survey of teachers and administrators on test-prep time for student assessments; prohibits the use of certain assessments to be used for anything other than diagnostic purposes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4712A |
2014-01-24 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2013-04-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06594 (Same As) 2014-02-07 - print number 6594a