NY S04702 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - PRINT NUMBER 4702A
Pending: Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - PRINT NUMBER 4702A
Pending: Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the treatment and placement of incarcerated people based upon gender identity; requires that incarcerated people in state and local correctional facilities who have a gender identity different from the person's assigned sex at birth be addressed and have access to commissary items, clothing and other materials that are consistent with the person's gender identity; and establishes that incarcerated people shall be presumptively placed in a correctional facility with persons of the gender that most closely aligns with such person's gender identity unless the person opts out of such placement, such person is free to change their mind and switch at any time.
Title
Relates to the treatment and placement of incarcerated people based upon gender identity; requires that incarcerated people in state and local correctional facilities who have a gender identity different from the person's assigned sex at birth be addressed and have access to commissary items, clothing and other materials that are consistent with the person's gender identity; and establishes that incarcerated people shall be presumptively placed in a correctional facility with persons of the gender that most closely aligns with such person's gender identity unless the person opts out of such placement, such person is free to change their mind and switch at any time.
Sponsors
Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] |
Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Zellnor Myrie [D] | Sen. Jessica Ramos [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4702A |
2020-03-11 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2019-03-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A05257 (Same As) 2020-11-06 - print number 5257a